This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 21:17:55 (UTC).

STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC vs Davis, Shem B

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Davis, Shem B. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul L, Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9115

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd, Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant

Davis, Shem B

Ruskin, FL 33573

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULTON , ANDREW, IV

Attorney at KELLEY, FULTON & KAPLAN, P.L.

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/16/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

LETTER TO

11/16/2021: LETTER TO

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/16/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: EXHIBIT "A" AS REFERRED IN COMPLAINT - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS - eservice@kelleylawoffice.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Davis, Shem B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: STARFISH TITLE AGENCY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FULTON, ANDREW