Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/11/2021 at 19:29:56 (UTC).

Stanley, Jack vs AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS, CORP.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Stanley, Jack filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS, CORP. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ficarrotta, N. Ronald, Stephens, Scott. Steven, Stephens, Steven. Scott, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1513

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ficarrotta, N. Ronald

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Stephens, Steven. Scott

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley, Jack

Tampa, FL 33635

Defendants

THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

GOULDS PUMP LLC

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

TAMPA SHIP LLC

GARDNER DEVNER INC

CATERPILLAR INC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

DEERE & COMPANY

G.G. OF FLORIDA INC

FLOWSERVE US INC

AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS, CORP.

600 N 2Nd Street Suite 401

Harrisburg, PA 17101

WARREN PUMP LLC

ITT CORPORATION

CRANE CO

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALONZO , MARK A.

Attorney at VINSON LAW, P.A.

400 E Palm Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

VINSON , BEN ANDREW, Jr

Attorney at VINSON LAW P.A.

400 E Palm Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5300

Miami, FL 33131

ZASLOW , ANDREW JAY

Attorney at MCFARLANE, DOLAN AND PRINCE

210 N University Dr Fl 6

Coral Springs, FL 33071

ALLEY , TODD CARLTON

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

CLARK , TIMOTHY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY CLARK, P.A.

915 Middle River Dr Ste 209

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

FELDMAN , BRET MICHAEL

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN

Attorney at FOLEY MANSFIELD PLLP

1395 Brickell Ave Fl 14

Miami, FL 33131

MEDINA , EDUARDO J

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

4770 Biscayne Blvd Ste 1000

Miami, FL 33137-3232

GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

FERREYRA , EDGARDO, Jr

Attorney at LUKS SANTANIELLO PETRILLO & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN ALLAN

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3600

Miami, FL 33131

TACKTILL , SCOTT ALLEN

Attorney at THE UNGER LAW GROUP, P.L.

1427 Lake Baldwin Ln

Orlando, FL 32814

SPURR , DALE JAY

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & JONES, LLC

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

YOUNT , SCOTT PARKER

Attorney at GARRISON YOUNT FORTE & MULCAHY LLC

601 Bayshore Blvd Ste 800

Tampa, FL 33606

BRISCOE , EDWARD J

Attorney at FOWLER WHITE BURNETT P A

1395 Brickell Ave Ste 14

Miami, FL 33131

UPSHAW , ANTHONY NOLAN

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

IOVINO , CAROLINE MARIE

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMEREY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/30/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/15/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/20/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/16/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/15/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/15/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FLOWSERVE US INC; Defendant: FMC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Comment: TRIAL THE WK OF 03-14-2022 W/ PTC ON 02-22-2022 @ 10:15; Additional Info: Defendant: AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS, CORP.; Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY; Defendant: BORG-WARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS INC; Defendant: BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC; Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC; Defendant: CBS CORPORATION; Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS INC; Defendant: CRANE CO; Defendant: DEERE & COMPANY; Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC; Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO; Defendant: FLOWSERVE US INC; Defendant: FMC CORPORATION; Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION; Defendant: G.G. OF FLORIDA INC; Defendant: GARDNER DEVNER INC; Defendant: GOULDS PUMP LLC; Defendant: GRINNELL LLC; Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC; Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC; Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION; Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY; Defendant: ITT CORPORATION; Defendant: LAMONS GASKET COMPANY; Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO; Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES INC; Defendant: STRAHMAN VALVES INC; Defendant: TAMPA SHIP LLC; Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY; Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP; Defendant: WARREN PUMP LLC; Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack; Plaintiff: STANLEY, NORMA; Private Attorney: ALLEY , TODD CARLTON; Private Attorney: ALONZO , MARK A.; Private Attorney: BRISCOE , EDWARD J; Private Attorney: CACHALDORA , AMANDA RAE; Private Attorney: CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA; Private Attorney: CLARK , TIMOTHY; Private Attorney: COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE; Private Attorney: FELDMAN , BRET MICHAEL; Private Attorney: FERGUSON , TIMOTHY JOHN; Private Attorney: GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II; Private Attorney: IOVINO , CAROLINE MARIE; Private Attorney: MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.; Private Attorney: MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN ALLAN; Private Attorney: MEDINA , EDUARDO J; Private Attorney: SPURR , DALE JAY; Private Attorney: TACKTILL , SCOTT ALLEN; Private Attorney: YOUNT , SCOTT PARKER; Private Attorney: ZASLOW , ANDREW JAY; Date Signed: 04/28/2021; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021210725; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021193796; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Defendant: CBS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021142651; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack; Plaintiff: STANLEY, NORMA

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stanley, Jack

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.G. OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS, CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY is a litigant