This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/15/2019 at 07:01:24 (UTC).

St. Thomas Properties LLC vs Freeman, Renice

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 St Thomas Properties LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Freeman, Renice. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, E. Jared. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7548

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, E. Jared

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. Thomas Properties LLC

12401 N 15Th Street

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant

Freeman, Renice

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , WHITNEY HELEN

Attorney at THE MGFD LAW FIRM, P.A.

2753 State Road 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/18/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

01/18/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/18/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

01/16/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/16/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/16/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

ANSWER

01/11/2019: ANSWER

COMPLAINT

12/26/2018: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/31/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/24/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/18/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

01/16/2019: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/08/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • EVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: 190522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • COURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: TO DETERMINE RENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - 2/25/19 @ 11:15 A.M.; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice; Private Attorney: DALY , WHITNEY HELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ORDER; Comment: ACTION TO BE TAKEN; Additional Info: Date 2: 02/06/2019; Judicial Officer: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: ON MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND FINAL HEARING FOR POSSESSION 02/26/2019 1:45 PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT / POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) AGAINST RENICE FREEMAN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO ANSWER FILED ON 1/11/19; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO ANSWER FILED ON 1/11/19; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION); Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Freeman, Renice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: St. Thomas Properties LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019105638; Judge: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less