This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/08/2021 at 19:33:37 (UTC).

SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.,BROOKS, KRISTEN vs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC ,BROOKS, KRISTEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4621

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

8551 West Sunrise Boulevard 304

Plantation, FL 33322

BROOKS, KRISTEN

Defendants

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

8333 Bryan Dairy Road

Largo, FL 33777

ALLSTATE

8333 Bryan Dairy Road

Largo, FL 33777

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK, P.A,

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/14/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/25/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Comment: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: 09/02/2021 DEFT. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ATTACHED PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE is a litigant

Latest cases where SPRINGER CHIROPRACTIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.