This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/20/2023 at 13:48:00 (UTC).

Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC vs Booher, Sara

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Booher, Sara. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan, Weis, A. Richard, Weis, Richard. A and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3642

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spring Oaks Capital Spv, Llc

Defendant

Booher, Sara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/29/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

12/30/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/04/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

02/03/2023: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/29/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION

01/30/2023: MOTION

COURT TICKET

02/01/2023: COURT TICKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2023048059; Judge: Weis, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563;; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC; Private Attorney: HANKINS , MARK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: Booher, Sara; Date Served: 01/04/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Booher, Sara;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Spring Oaks Capital SPV, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less