Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/28/2021 at 12:39:53 (UTC).

SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A,WATSON, CIMONE vs MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 SPINE SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P A,WATSON, CIMONE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0450

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

Sunrise, FL 33323

WATSON, CIMONE

Defendant

MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

CHINCHILLA , JONATHAN STUART

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSOC

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/26/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/26/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/26/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE & SPORT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chinchilla, Jonathan Stuart