This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 01:04:44 (UTC).

SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC,Horne, Otis vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC,Horne, Otis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4701

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

Sunrise, FL 33323

Horne, Otis

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 600 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Attorney at TODD LANDAU, P.A.

4601 Sheridan St Ste 200

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

PLAZA RIOS , YOLANDA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/11/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/11/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/12/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/11/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

09/09/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/15/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Plaza Rios, Yolanda