This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/02/2022 at 07:21:14 (UTC).

SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC,Staten, Stephanie vs UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC,Staten, Stephanie filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6627

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

Tampa, FL 33607

Staten, Stephanie

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

GLENN , REBECCA ANN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT TETREAULT

Usaa Staff Counsel- Tampa 100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/26/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/26/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/26/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a foreign

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALIST, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman