This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 13:11:51 (UTC).

SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.,Kozlova, Natalia vs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P A ,Kozlova, Natalia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6963

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Kozlova, Natalia

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Attorney at TODD LANDAU, P.A.

4601 Sheridan St Ste 200

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

LA MONTAGNE , RACHEL MARIE

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/02/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SPINAL HEALTH AND REHAB, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landau, Todd A