Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2021 at 19:53:33 (UTC).

SPARKS, LITCH, Jr - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 SPARKS, LITCH, Jr - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0538

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

Morgan, Madeline Zontee

San Antonio, TX 78260

SPARKS FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED

24231 Vecchio

San Antonio, TX 78260

FOSTER, SARAH

Bakersfield, CA 93313

STEVES, LEE ANN

Canyon Lake, TX 78133

LIPPERT, DAWN

Bakersfield, CA 93301

SNODGRASS, ASHLEY

Shasta Lake, CA 96019

GARONE, JOHN

Bakersfield, CA 93311

WISDOM-WILLIAMS, ABBIE

Pretty Prairie, KS 67570

SPARKS, ROBERT

Plano, TX 75023

MUNDY, SHEILA SPARKS

Florence, CO 81266

SPARKS, BECKY

Fritch, TX 79036

SPARKS, GENE

Midland, TX 79707

KELLY, KATHY

Bakersfield, CA 93301

BOXFORD, DON

Wenaatchee, WA 98801

FOSTER, LINDEY

Bakersfield, CA 93313

URIAS, KELLY

Tehachapi, CA 93561

Decedent

SPARKS, LITCH, Jr

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

JOHNSON , LORIEN SMITH

Attorney at LORIEN S. JOHNSON, LLC

3107 W Fair Oaks Ave

Tampa, FL 33611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Comment: NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIFTH - FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: FOUTH AMENDED PET ADMIN; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC FORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: THIRD AMENDED PET SUMM ADMIN; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: KELLEY URIAS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: DAVID TOBACK ESQ DATED 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPET FOR SUMMARY ADMIN W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ADMIT; Comment: FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION; Comment: FOR APPOINMENT OF COMMISSIONER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: MADELINE ZONTEE MORGAN; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Petitioner: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE; Trustee: MORGAN, MADELINE ZONTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON , LORIEN SMITH