This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 08:24:00 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC,Catley, Elisa vs FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC,Catley, Elisa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5839

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Catley, Elisa

Defendant

FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESTOY , FAUSTINO POMPOSO, III

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 330

Jacksonville, FL 32211-3112

Defendant Attorney

EASTERLING , TAISHA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/31/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/15/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/25/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Farmers Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estoy, Faustino Pomposo III