This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2020 at 19:25:42 (UTC).

SOUFAN, NASHAT vs CLARK, TERRY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 SOUFAN, NASHAT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CLARK, TERRY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0578

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUFAN, NASHAT

Tampa, FL 33646

Defendant

CLARK, TERRY

Lutz, FL 33559

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

07/16/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: CLARK, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 09/15/2020; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 9/10/20 @ 2:45 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: CLARK, TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT; Date Served: 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOUFAN, NASHAT

    Read MoreRead Less