This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/04/2019 at 14:22:16 (UTC).

SONLEY RETAIL LLC vs JP COLORADO LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 SONLEY RETAIL LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JP COLORADO LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Manning, M. Daryl and Peacock, A. Emily. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0652

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Manning, M. Daryl

Peacock, A. Emily

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONLEY RETAIL LLC

4949 South Niagara Street #300

Denver, CO 80112

Defendants

JP COLORADO LLC

13907Carrollwood Village Run

Tampa, FL 33618

RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

Tampa, FL 33618

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PARRY , IAN ANDREW

Attorney at ROCKE, MCLEAN & SBAR, P.A.

2309 S Macdill Ave

Tampa, FL 33629

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO CONTEST

04/30/2019: MOTION TO CONTEST

LIS PENDENS

04/30/2019: LIS PENDENS

LIS PENDENS

04/30/2019: LIS PENDENS

AGREED ORDER

04/09/2019: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

04/02/2019: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/07/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL

03/06/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL

AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

01/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

01/18/2019: ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

01/22/2019: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

01/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

01/18/2019: ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

Fee Worksheet

01/18/2019: Fee Worksheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO CONTEST; Additional Info: Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER; Comment: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FACT INFORMATION SHEET - THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE DEF ALEXANDER RAPPAPORT SHALL HAVE 30 DAYS TO COMPLETE HIS DUE DILIGENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JP COLORADO LLC; Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G; Plaintiff: SONLEY RETAIL LLC; Private Attorney: PARRY , IAN ANDREW; Date Signed: 04/09/2019; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SONLEY RETAIL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • REGISTERED MAIL TO; Comment: AS TO AMENDED NOTICE OF RECORDING; Additional Info: Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Comment: PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL FACT INFORMATION SHEET & MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: RAPPAPORT, ALEXANDER G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SONLEY RETAIL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: FACT INFORMATION SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SONLEY RETAIL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • REGISTERED MAIL TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less