This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 02:44:28 (UTC).

SOLOMON, GEOWRENA vs WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 SOLOMON, GEOWRENA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett and Battles, Emmett L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8022

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Battles, Emmett L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLOMON, GEOWRENA

Defendants

THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADY , NICHOLAS A

Defendant Attorneys

LOPEZ , BURKE GEORGE

LEHNER , STEVEN DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE

12/12/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/31/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/31/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

10/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/21/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/21/2022: COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3078346388 MEETING ID: 307 834 6388NO PASSWORD REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD; Private Attorney: LOPEZ , BURKE GEORGE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Defendant: WILLIS, STEVEN LENARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 09/27/2022 DEFT THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA; Private Attorney: BRADY , NICHOLAS A;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SOLOMON, GEOWRENA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less