This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/17/2021 at 10:48:20 (UTC).

Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank vs Oliver, Johnny

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Oliver, Johnny. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl, Thomas, Cheryl. K and Thomas, Cheryl K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5676

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

Thomas, Cheryl K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Oliver, Johnny

Riverview, FL 33579-2418

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN , DESIREE MARIA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/02/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

COMPLAINT

07/08/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/09/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/08/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/93553574539 MEETING ID: 935 5357 4539 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDCOURTCALL 888-882-6878 Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021458043; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: BANK; Judgment Description: BANKRUPTCY; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Additional Info: Defendant: Oliver, Johnny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: Johnny Oliver 7/15/2021 Substitute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: Oliver, Johnny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sofi Lending Corp As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOFI LENDING CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAVIN DESIREE M