This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 20:56:04 (UTC).

Snap-On Credit Llc vs Santiago, Angel

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Snap-On Credit Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Santiago, Angel. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2815

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Snap-On Credit Llc

806 S Douglas Rd Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

Santiago, Angel

Tampa, FL 33612-5914

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACHER , JEFFREY W

Attorney at POLLACK & ROSEN, P.A.

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

12/28/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

01/13/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM LINK HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/95711376746 MEETING ID 957 1137 6746; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: ANGEL SANTIAGO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc; Private Attorney: BLACHER , JEFFREY W;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Santiago, Angel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less