This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/06/2023 at 09:33:09 (UTC).

Snap-On Credit LLC vs Calkins, Kevin

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Snap-On Credit LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Calkins, Kevin. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2827

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, J. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Snap-On Credit Llc

Defendant

Calkins, Kevin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACHER , JEFFREY W

Defendant Attorney

IKERD , CHRISTOPHER FREDERIC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/29/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: COMPLAINT

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/11/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

01/30/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/30/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER

04/06/2023: ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/06/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER OF DEFAULT

04/12/2023: ORDER OF DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

04/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

04/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2023187858; Judge: Hooi, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Additional Info: Defendant: Calkins, Kevin; Date Signed: 04/12/2023; Judicial Officer:: Hooi, Michael J;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY JUDICIAL AGAINST KEVIN CALKINS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Calkins, Kevin; Date 2: 04/06/2023; Judicial Officer:: Hooi, Michael J;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Calkins, Kevin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Calkins, Kevin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KEVIN CALKINS, JANUARY 10, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Calkins, Kevin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Snap-On Credit LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less