This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 03:02:04 (UTC).

SMITH, SCOTT vs THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 SMITH, SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3544

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, SCOTT

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

201 N. Franklin Street Suite 700

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAINZ , ROBERT RYAN

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Ste 700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

HERMIDA , ROLAND A, II

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

07/01/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/25/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/20/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/29/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/28/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON; Comment: FOR DEFT AS STATED HEREIN; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; Date Signed: 08/03/2021; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SMITH, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R RYAN SAINZ