This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/22/2019 at 07:25:15 (UTC).

SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L vs SMALLWOOD, KYLE B

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMALLWOOD, KYLE B. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McNeil, Artemeus. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7291

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McNeil, Artemeus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L

Valrico, FL 33594

Respondent

SMALLWOOD, KYLE B

Valrico, FL 33594

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • FILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE; Comment: 1vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • FILE SENT TO REC CTR FROM PC FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL (FAMILY); Comment: TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS IFP; Additional Info: Petitioner: SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L; Respondent: SMALLWOOD, KYLE B; Date Signed: 11/14/2018; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus; Vol./Book: 26218, Page: 1617, Number of Pages: 1617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • EMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT; Comment: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • MOTION; Comment: VERIFIED MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • FILE SENT TO; Comment: JUDGE MCNEIL - MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH ATTACHMENTS; Additional Info: Petitioner: SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L; Respondent: SMALLWOOD, KYLE B; Date 2: 11/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • SHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • SHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS PLANT CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • STAY AWAY FROM; Comment: 3812 SOUTHVIEW DR. BRANDON FL 33511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • INJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION (FAMILY); Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, it has been denied by the court. A supplemental petition with additional facts may be filed within 7 days for review by a judge. Please come to one of our location to pick up a copy of the order denying you; Additional Info: Petitioner: SMALLWOOD, ANDREA L; Respondent: SMALLWOOD, KYLE B; Date Signed: 11/06/2018; Vol./Book: 26202, Page: 401, Number of Pages: 401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Order Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 1 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: McNeil, Artemeus

    Read MoreRead Less