Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/06/2021 at 00:05:48 (UTC).

SLATER, BAILEY L vs PEREZ, JONATHAN J.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 SLATER, BAILEY L filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PEREZ, JONATHAN J. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, E. Jared, Smith, Jared. E and Smith, Jared E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5280

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, E. Jared

Smith, Jared. E

Smith, Jared E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SLATER, BAILEY L

Land O Lakes, FL 34638

Respondent

PEREZ, JONATHAN J.

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CORN , MARY BETH

Attorney at MARY BETH CORN, P.A.

156 E Bloomingdale Ave

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 411 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Smith, Jared E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTCHD RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JONATHAN J. PEREZ 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPATERNITY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Respondent: PEREZ, JONATHAN J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SLATER, BAILEY L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORN , MARY BETH