This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 12:56:07 (UTC).

SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC vs UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6822

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

Miami, FL 33135

HERRERA, MARIA

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 1011

St. Petersburg, FL 33731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ , ROBERT FRANCIS

Attorney at THE FLORIDA INSURANCE LAW GROUP, LLC

8724 Sw 72Nd St # 260

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/30/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/30/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, SCOTT ST. JOHN, August 1, 2022 ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SHRINK WRAP PRO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.