This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/28/2021 at 15:02:50 (UTC).

SHELBY, JACQUELYN vs BOERNER, ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 SHELBY, JACQUELYN filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOERNER, ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard, Weis, Richard. A and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4632

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHELBY, JACQUELYN

Dover, FL 33527

Respondent

BOERNER, ALEXANDER

Tampa, FL 33610

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order 10/25/2021 O; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 IN-PERSON 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketFILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - PC; Comment: 1VOL-FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS; Comment: PETITIONER'S 10/22/2021 MOTION TO DISMISS STAMPED RECEIVED BY JUDGE; COPY OF P.1 MAILED TO THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED AND TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST THE RESPONDENT IS DISSOLVED Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-10-25 16:32. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN; Respondent: BOERNER, ALEXANDER; Date Signed: 10/25/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: W/PROPOSED ORDER AND NOH ATTACHED; Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketFILE SENT TO; Comment: THE PRESIDING JUDGE: 1VOL AND A COPY OF PETITIONER'S 10/22/2021 MTN TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, PETITION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: BOERNER, ALEXANDER; Date Served: 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPETS; Comment: DOG - SMOKEY AMERICAN BULLDOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPARTY SIGNED UP FOR SMS TEXT MESSAGING; Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PCCS-PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN; Respondent: BOERNER, ALEXANDER; Date Signed: 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: TIWOC-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: SHELBY, JACQUELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT; Comment: Temporary/Amended Injunctions Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-10-19 15:47.

    Read MoreRead Less