This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 16:41:11 (UTC).

Shearer, Michael vs Wanko, Jeffrey

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Shearer, Michael filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wanko, Jeffrey. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5521

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shearer, Michael

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

USAA General Indemnity Company

9800 Fredericksburg

San Antonio, TX 78288

Wanko, Jeffrey

Apollo Beach, FL 33572

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIRALOSI, MEGAN LOUISE

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602-5157

Defendant Attorney

BLUNT , CRISTINA ACOSTA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT D. TETREAULT

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/03/2022: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/28/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER

07/26/2022: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT

07/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/29/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/29/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX NUMBER 904-900-2303 ENTER ACCESS CODE: 132 878 9681 Judicial Officer: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company; Defendant: Wanko, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shearer, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company; Defendant: Wanko, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISTINA A BLUNT