This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2021 at 18:19:39 (UTC).

Shazam Auto Glass, Llc vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Shazam Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3557

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shazam Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Rosalia Eizmendiz

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

EIZMENDIZ, ROSALIA

Shazam Auto Glass, Llc

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIETO , ANTHONY THOMAS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

SMITH-MARIN , LUCAS RAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/09/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: PENDING RESOLUTION OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: IN WHICH TO RESPOND TOTHE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shazam Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shazam Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shazam Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Shazam Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAZAM AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRIETO , ANTHONY THOMAS