This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 12/06/2021 at 10:58:56 (UTC).

Sen, Briti vs Banda, Eric

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Sen, Briti filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Banda, Eric. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Peacock, Emily A and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6790

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily A

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sen, Briti

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

Banda, Eric

Plant City, FL 33566

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ , GINA NICOLLE

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

BROOKINS , STARR LINETTE

Attorney at ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY STAFF COUNSEL

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/20/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/20/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/20/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/20/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

08/20/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/20/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sen, Briti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Banda, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ , GINA NICOLLE