This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/15/2021 at 16:38:12 (UTC).

SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr vs SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Farfante, Darren D, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5141

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Farfante, Darren D

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

Tampa, FL 33604

Respondent

SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

Tampa, FL 33604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRESTON , SUMMER

Attorney at SUMMER PRESTON, P.A.

Law Office Of Summer Preston, P.A. 5331 Primrose Lake Cir Ste 115

Tampa, FL 33647

Respondent Attorney

SCULLY , KRISTIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at KIRKNER FAMILY LAW GROUP, P.A.

707 W Swann Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 401 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT OF THE STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW CASES; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOT ATTACHED; WIFES FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO COUNTER-PETITION; Comment: FOR DOM AND OTHER RELIEF; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR RESP; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Respondent: SEGARRA, ANGELA CHANTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: SEGARRA, PAUL, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less