This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 13:53:37 (UTC).

SCOTT, JOSHUA A. vs MAPLEBEAR, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 SCOTT, JOSHUA A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAPLEBEAR, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul L, Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5951

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

Riverview, FL 33578

Defendants

TORRES, CARLOS E.

Fort Mead, FL 33841

TORRES, DANIELLE A.

Wimamua, FL 33598

MAPLEBEAR, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 22234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA , ALEJANDRO MIGUEL

Attorney at STEINGER, GREENE & FEINER

201 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/14/2022: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/18/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/18/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/18/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/14/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022362653; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DANIELLE A. TORRES 7/19/2022 PERSONAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MAPLEBEAR, INC. 7/20/2022 CORPORATE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CARLOS E TORRES 7/20/2022 SUBSTITUTE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: MAPLEBEAR, INC.; Defendant: TORRES, CARLOS E.; Defendant: TORRES, DANIELLE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SCOTT, JOSHUA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alejandro M Garcia (esq)