This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:08:10 (UTC).

Schlemmer, Dustin vs CitiGroup Inc

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Schlemmer, Dustin filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CitiGroup Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2854

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schlemmer, Dustin

Defendant

CitiGroup Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK , RICHARD KING, IV

 

Court Documents

MOTION

12/27/2022: MOTION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LETTER FROM CLERK

12/28/2022: LETTER FROM CLERK

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

12/28/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/26/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/10/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023104032; Judge: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: SET IN ERROR; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 309 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: CITIGROUP INC C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM ITS REGISTERED AGENT- 01/18/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA HOVER - MFC; Comment: MFC Order ID: 34326183

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CitiGroup Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Schlemmer, Dustin;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less