This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/14/2021 at 01:11:11 (UTC).

SCHLEISNER, KELLY vs LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 SCHLEISNER, KELLY filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, Richard. A, Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5640

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHLEISNER, KELLY

Thonotosassa, FL 33592

Respondent

LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR

Brandon, FL 00000

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-05-06 11:17. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY; Respondent: LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR; Date Served: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM; Comment: 9325 GOVERNORS RUN DRIVE SEFFNER FL 33584

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPARTY SIGNED UP FOR SMS TEXT MESSAGING; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: DIV V;; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY; Respondent: LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR; Date Signed: 04/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: SCHLEISNER, KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Respondent: LOPEZ, MIGUEL JR

    Read MoreRead Less