This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/18/2019 at 09:24:17 (UTC).

SAYRE, ROSE S vs SAYRE, BRADLEY D

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 SAYRE, ROSE S filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAYRE, BRADLEY D. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9654

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAYRE, ROSE S

Seattle, WA 98136

Respondent

SAYRE, BRADLEY D

Dade City, FL 33525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LASLEY, MINDI BETH, Esquire

Attorney at MINDI LASLEY, PA

1005 N Marion Street

Tampa, FL 33602-3404

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • NAME CHANGE REPORTED ELECTRONICALLY TO FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S; Respondent: SAYRE, BRADLEY D; Date Signed: 03/06/2019; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh; Vol./Book: 26463, Page: 945, Number of Pages: 945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • INITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 03/05/2019; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S; Respondent: SAYRE, BRADLEY D; Signed: 03/05/2019; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh; Vol./Book: 26472, Page: 762, Number of Pages: 762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S; Private Attorney: LASLEY, MINDI BETH, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING; Comment: UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • ANSWER- WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Comment: BY RESP; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; DR LICENSE OF RESPONDENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED; WIFES FL DR LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Comment: JOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: SAYRE, ROSE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 413 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less