This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 18:27:06 (UTC).

SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER,Darnell, Lucas vs ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER,Darnell, Lucas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack and Gutman, Jack. N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6524

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Darnell, Lucas

Defendant

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

LA MONTAGNE , RACHEL MARIE

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/30/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/02/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: Rachel M. LaMontagne; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA MEDICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.