Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 10:37:14 (UTC).

SANTOS LEONOR PEREZ as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.J.P., R.J.P., and P.J.P. vs PARRON PROPERTIES LP

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 SANTOS LEONOR PEREZ as Parent and Natural Guardian of H J P , R J P , and P J P filed an Other lawsuit against PARRON PROPERTIES LP. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6596

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANTOS LEONOR PEREZ as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.J.P., R.J.P., and P.J.P.

Plant City, FL 33563

ELIZABETH LYON-HALL as Plenary Guardian of the Person and Property of HUMBERTO JUAREZ-VELAZQUEZ

Defendants

ERMATOR INC

PARRON INC

10702 North 46Th Street

Tampa, FL 33617

NEWORLD PROPERTIES INC

PARRON PROPERTIES LP

10702 North 46St Street

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WRIGHT , JOSHUA DOUGLAS

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

PADOVANO , PHILIP JOHN

Attorney at BRANNOCK & HUMPHRIES, P.A.

131 N Gadsden St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

NEWLANDS , SHANE A

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

511 W Bay St Ste 450

Tampa, FL 33606

BIGGER , BRENT R.

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER, PLLC

511 W Bay St Ste 450

Tampa, FL 33606

CLARK , WILLIAM LEE

Attorney at THE CLARK FIRM

9103 Kingsbury Pl

Bradenton, FL 34212

Defendant Attorneys

LOPEZ , BURKE GEORGE

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33602

RAWLS , C HUNTER

Attorney at FISHER & SAULS P.A.

100 2Nd Ave S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

REITER, JACK ROY

Attorney at GRAY ROBINSON, P.A.

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL

08/20/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/20/2018: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

06/06/2018: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

05/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/14/2018: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

01/15/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

10/18/2017: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/14/2016: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/01/2018: ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT

TRANSCRIPT

10/22/2018: TRANSCRIPT

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/09/2018: MOTION TO STRIKE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

07/30/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED WITNESS LIST

07/11/2018: AMENDED WITNESS LIST

REPLY

03/08/2018: REPLY

NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

05/05/2017: NOTICE TO SET FOR TRIAL

REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/08/2017: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

03/03/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/14/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

262 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-4120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • ORDER FROM DCA; Comment: 2D18-4120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LYON-HALL as Plenary Guardian of the Person and Property of HUMBERTO JUAREZ-VELAZQUEZ; Plaintiff: SANTOS LEONOR PEREZ as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.J.P., R.J.P., and P.J.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S - FOR REHEARING AND RECONSIDERATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LYON-HALL as Plenary Guardian of the Person and Property of HUMBERTO JUAREZ-VELAZQUEZ; Plaintiff: SANTOS LEONOR PEREZ as Parent and Natural Guardian of H.J.P., R.J.P., and P.J.P.; Date 2: 02/12/2019; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • APPEAL CASE PREPARED FOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • 2DCA RECORD ON APPEAL; Comment: 18-4120-RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • FEE LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ERMATOR INC; Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LYON-HALL as Plenary Guardian of the Person and Property of HUMBERTO JUAREZ-VELAZQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • APPEAL CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DEF PARRON PROPERTIES, LP AND PARRON, INC. - TAX COSTS; Additional Info: Defendant: PARRON INC; Defendant: PARRON PROPERTIES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
404 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2016473576; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGSJ; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2018403760; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: PSJ; Judgment Description: PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2018378082; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGSJ; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2018185496; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2018082610; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack R Reiter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ , BURKE GEORGE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C HUNTER RAWLS