This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/22/2022 at 00:57:50 (UTC).

SANSOM, RAYMOND - Estate

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 SANSOM, RAYMOND - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2369

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

SANSOM, JOSEPH

Lutz, FL 33549

Decedent

SANSOM, RAYMOND

Lutz, FL 33549

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

CHAVERNAY , MARLA E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE R. BREZINA, JR. PA

1218 Oakfield Dr

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: JOSEPH SANSOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: 1ST PUB: 07/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: COPY PAID FUNERAL BILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Date 2: 07/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: DATED 6/28/22; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: CHAVERNAY , MARLA E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL; Comment: NO COPY ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: JOSEPH SANSOM; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL - FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFED TO SUBMIT THE ORIGINAL PAPERWORK TO THE CLERKS OFFICE FOR PROCESSING; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: WILL RECEIPT INFO - 21WD1822; Additional Info: Beneficiary: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Personal Representative: SANSOM, JOSEPH; Petitioner: SANSOM, JOSEPH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less