This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/15/2022 at 15:05:03 (UTC).

Sanchez, Robert vs Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Sanchez, Robert filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4270

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Robert

Plant City, FL 33566

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ , MANUEL JOSE

Attorney at RYWANT, ALVAREZ, JONES, RUSSO & GUYTON,

302 Knights Run Ave Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

STOVER , HEATHER LORRAINE

Attorney at OGDEN & SULLIVAN, P.A.

5422 Bay Center Dr Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609

SULLIVAN , KEVIN MATTHEW

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

HEARING , GREGORY ALAN

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/24/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

05/20/2022: ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

05/19/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES COUNTERCLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/THIRDPTY

04/12/2022: ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES COUNTERCLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/THIRDPTY

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/12/2022: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/29/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/16/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

03/04/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/04/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/03/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/03/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Date Signed: 05/20/2022; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES COUNTERCLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/THIRDPTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Sanchez, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , MANUEL JOSE