This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 01:39:16 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, PAMELA vs TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 SANCHEZ, PAMELA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer, Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, Jennifer X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6146

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, PAMELA

St. Petersburg, FL 33707

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY , HEATH CLAYTON

Attorney at JONES LAW GROUP

5622 Central Ave

Saint Petersburg, FL 33707

Defendant Attorney

SOTO , NICOLE FARINAS

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/21/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/22/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/01/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230 Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE FOR TARGET CORPORATION - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA; Private Attorney: MURPHY , HEATH CLAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SANCHEZ, PAMELA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOTO , NICOLE FARINAS