This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 05:01:07 (UTC).

Samuel, Nichole Leona vs Samuel, Lazarus

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Samuel, Nichole Leona filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Samuel, Lazarus. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Palermo, Thomas. N, Palermo, N. Thomas and Palermo, Thomas N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3188

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Palermo, Thomas. N

Palermo, N. Thomas

Palermo, Thomas N

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Samuel, Nichole Leona

Riverview, FL 33578

Respondent

Samuel, Lazarus

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STRACHAN , LASHAWN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LASHAWN STRACHAN

5118 N 56Th St Ste 102

Tampa, FL 33610

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Cancelled Comments: Final Order Entered; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 408 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Palermo, Thomas N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona; Respondent: Samuel, Lazarus; Signed: 05/12/2022; Judicial Officer: Palermo, Thomas N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: OF THE WIFE'S DRIVER'S LICENSE (REDACTED) -ATTACHED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: OF DRIVER'S LICENSE - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: Samuel, Lazarus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: Samuel, Lazarus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Samuel, Nichole Leona

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRACHAN , LASHAWN