This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 13:05:36 (UTC).

Same Day Calibrations, LLC vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Same Day Calibrations, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1664

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosario, Jonathan

Same Day Calibrations, LLC

C/O Reeder And Nussbaum, Pa 2201 4Th Street North Suite G

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra 200 East Gaines Street.

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM, P.A.

2201 4Th St N Ste G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON , APRIL YOLANDA

Attorney at GEICO STAFF COUNSEL

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/16/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/16/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/16/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/16/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/16/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/17/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/29/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/03/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION

08/03/2022: MOTION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/03/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: OR SUMMARY DISPOSITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY DISPOSITION BASED UPON DEFENDANT VOLUNTARY PAYMENT AFTER THE LAWSUIT WAS FILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosario, Jonathan; Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: COSTS, INTEREST ON FEES AND COSTS FROM DATE OF ENTITLEMENT, RISK MULTIPLIER, TAXATION OF ATTORNEY FEE EXPERT COSTS AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosario, Jonathan; Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Same Day Calibrations, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Same Day Calibrations LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUSSBAUM , MARC BRETT