This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 01:05:09 (UTC).

SALVADOR DOGI, LLC vs JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 SALVADOR DOGI, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Hinson, Carl C. and Polo, Melissa. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7572

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, M.. Melissa

Hinson, Carl C.

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

SALVADOR DOGI, LLC

1920 E Hallandale Bch Blvd Ste 702

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.

1726 E 7Th Avenue Ste 11

Tampa, FL 33605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELLORUSSO , FRANK

Attorney at SOUTH FLORIDA LAW PLLC

1920 E Hallandale Beach Blvd Ste 702

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant Attorneys

GREMINGER , CHRISTIAN ANDREW

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

Counter Plaintiff Attorney

DARBY , AMY MICHELE

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/08/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

09/08/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/08/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

11/04/2022: E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/23/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED; Comment: COS 11/04/2022 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JEREL MCCANTS ARCHITECTURE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: RELATED CASE: Pinellas County 22-000151-CI; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SALVADOR DOGI, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SALVADOR DOGI, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SALVADOR DOGI, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less