This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/30/2019 at 12:09:55 (UTC).

SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD. vs BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BROWN, JEANINE RENEE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1845

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD.

C/O Rolfe & Lobello, P.A. 720 Blackstone Building 233 East Bay Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

Riverview, FL 33578

Garnishee

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROLFE , LAWRENCE C

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202

LOBELLO , THOMAS, III

Attorney at ROLFE & LOBELLO, P.A.

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Garnishee Attorneys

GIBSON, JEFFREY W, Esquire

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN

201 N Franklin St Ste 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

GIBSON , JEFFREY W.

Po Box 1531

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

03/26/2019: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE

03/20/2019: NOTICE

RETURNED MAIL

02/21/2019: RETURNED MAIL

E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

02/20/2019: E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION

02/15/2019: MOTION

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF EXECUTION

02/15/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF EXECUTION

EXECUTION ISSUED

02/15/2019: EXECUTION ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

01/10/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

Fee Worksheet

01/11/2019: Fee Worksheet

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

01/11/2019: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

REGISTERED MAIL TO

01/11/2019: REGISTERED MAIL TO

AFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

01/10/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

01/10/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

FOREIGN JUDGMENT

01/10/2019: FOREIGN JUDGMENT

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

01/10/2019: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: RE: MOTION FILED 3/20/2019..NOTED SET HEARING 3/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: 04/03/19 @ 11:15 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING SET 4/3/19 AT 11:15 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD.; Date Signed: 03/26/2019; Judicial Officer: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Comment: SET 4/3/19 @ 11:15 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Comment: TO EXPEDITE HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SAGE FINANCIAL, LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Garnishee: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Additional Info: Defendant: BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: BROWN, JEANINE RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST; Additional Info: Private Attorney: ROLFE , LAWRENCE C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketFOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODWG; Judgment Description: ORDER DISMISSING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Judge: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less