This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 05:37:26 (UTC).

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,MILLER, DAWN vs SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,MILLER, DAWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4219

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

MILLER, DAWN

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Florida Chief Financial Officer 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN , ERMA FREDRECA

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/03/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/03/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

03/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/30/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022164740; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN , ERMA FREDRECA