This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 02:50:45 (UTC).

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Morrisette, Jeannette vs HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Morrisette, Jeannette filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack and Gutman, Jack. N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2871

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Morrisette, Jeannette

Defendant

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN , LYNDSEY CHRISTINA

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT, & KISSANE

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/08/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/08/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/08/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/10/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/10/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/24/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

08/24/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.