This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 02:49:43 (UTC).

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Taylor, Angela vs DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Taylor, Angela filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4045

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Taylor, Angela

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/05/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/05/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/20/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/14/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021522321; Judge: Judge, Senior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.