This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 11/03/2022 at 04:18:33 (UTC).

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Bonhomme, Micksonn vs ALERT AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC,Bonhomme, Micksonn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALERT AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6070

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Bonhomme, Micksonn

Defendant

ALERT AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Attorney at TODD LANDAU, P.A.

2699 Stirling Rd Ste C305A

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/30/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/11/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022342938; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALERT AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALERT AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RX IMAGING OF SWFL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landau, Todd A