This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/03/2023 at 14:52:29 (UTC).

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.,Novick, Steven vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC ,Novick, Steven filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6660

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

Novick, Steven

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/26/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/06/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less