This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/13/2022 at 04:24:37 (UTC).

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.,Cochran, Sidney vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC ,Cochran, Sidney filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack and Gutman, Jack. N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6125

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Cochran, Sidney

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

PLAZA RIOS , YOLANDA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/16/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/15/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/07/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

09/09/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/12/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/12/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/12/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/12/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: FIRST ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: OF FIRST SET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "E-MAIL ADDRESS", NOT ATTACHED ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL - REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL - REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSE RADIOLOGY CENTERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Plaza Rios, Yolanda