This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2019 at 13:38:20 (UTC).

ROSARIO, MARIBEL vs TAMPA BAY SURGERY CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 ROSARIO, MARIBEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAMPA BAY SURGERY CENTER. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7698

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Defendants

RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA

SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY

SIERRA SURGICAL

MILLENNIUM LABORATORIES

MILLENIUM HEALTH LLC

HCS ACUTE CARE CENTER LLC

SEA SPINE ORTHOPEDIC

SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES LLC

MOHAMMED H BAWANY, PA

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

PRESCRIPTION PARTNERS LLC

CAPIO PARTNERS LLC

SEA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS INSTITURE LLC

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

NORTH TAMPA ANESTHESIA

SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC

GLOBAL NEURO AND SPINE INSTITUTE

PHYSIATRIC PAIN & MEDICAL REHABILITATION CLINIC PA

SURGICAL DEVICE EXCHANGE LLC

ALL PARTNERS NETWORK PLLC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOBES , MERRILEE ANN

Attorney at JOBES LAW FIRM, LLC

3107 W Hallandale Beach Blvd Ste 101

Hallandale, FL 33009

Other Attorneys

KAPLAN , CONSTANCE JOY

Attorney at HAMMEL AND KAPLAN, LLC.

1040 Bayview Dr Ste 516

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

PRUGH , TIMOTHY F, Esquire

Attorney at PRUGH & ASSOCIATES, PA

1009 W Platt St

Tampa, FL 33606

BARUCH , JASON H

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ANSWER

08/29/2017: ANSWER

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

RESPONSE

01/24/2019: RESPONSE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/15/2017: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/15/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR INTERPLEADER; Additional Info: Defendant: NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com; Additional Info: Defendant: AFO IMAGING INC; Defendant: ALL PARTNERS NETWORK PLLC; Defendant: CAPIO PARTNERS LLC; Defendant: FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC; Defendant: HCS ACUTE CARE CENTER LLC; Defendant: MILLENIUM HEALTH LLC; Defendant: MOHAMMED H BAWANY, PA; Defendant: NORTH TAMPA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANTS, PA; Defendant: PHYSIATRIC PAIN & MEDICAL REHABILITATION CLINIC PA; Defendant: PRESCRIPTION PARTNERS LLC; Defendant: SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC; Defendant: SURGICAL DEVICE EXCHANGE LLC; Defendant: SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES LLC; Defendant: TYY CONSULTING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 14 Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO AMENDED PETITIOIN FOR INTERPLEADER; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA BAY SURGERY CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO INTERPLEADER; Additional Info: Defendant: SEA SPINE ORTHOPEDIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: MERRILEE A JOBES, ESQ; Additional Info: Defendant: SEA SPINE ORTHOPEDIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA BAY SURGERY CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / NO EXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: PETITION FOR INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: Prugh.efile@prughlaw.com ; dfarr@prughlaw.com ; bibi@prughlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketDismissal Docket; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 503 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURGICAL MONITORING SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Capio Partners, LLC is a litigant