This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/24/2021 at 12:52:24 (UTC).

Rosa, Daisy vs CMJ-FEE, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Rosa, Daisy filed an Other lawsuit against CMJ-FEE, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9278

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosa, Daisy

Valrico, FL 33596

Rosa, Jose

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendants

CMJ-FEE, LLC

801 U.S. Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

M & J WILKOW, LTD., INC.

20 South Clark Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60603

M & J WILKOW PROPERTIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS , KIM EDWIN

Attorney at WELLS LAW GROUP

3626 Erindale Dr

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendant Attorney

FALKOWSKI , MICHAEL P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JACK D. EVANS

1 N Dale Mabry Hwy Ste 805

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/22/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: M & J WILKOW PROPERTIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: 1. Affidavit of Service for Defendant, CMJ-FEE, LLC. NOT ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/11/20 DEFT CMJ -FEE , LLC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ( 1 ) 1. Affidavit of Service for Defendant, CMJ-FEE, LLC.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2; Additional Info: Defendant: CMJ-FEE, LLC; Defendant: M & J WILKOW, LTD., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rosa, Daisy; Plaintiff: Rosa, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS , KIM EDWIN