Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/17/2021 at 07:35:02 (UTC).

Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN vs Spangler, Donna L.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Ronald J Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R Hangen, as P R of the Estate of Ronald J hANGEN filed an Other lawsuit against Spangler, Donna L. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoddard, C.. Ralph, Stoddard, Ralph. C. and Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9716

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

Stoddard, Ralph. C.

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Tampa Health Properties LTD

Na Na

Na, FL 00000

Sovereign Healthcare of Tampa, LLC

115 N. Calhoun Street Suite 4Q

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Spangler, Donna L.

Tampa, FL 33611

Duplantis, Jason

Tampa, FL 33611

Sovereign Healthcare Holdings, LLC

115 North Calhoun Street Suite 4

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Southern Healthcare Management, LLC

115 North Calhoun Street Suite 4

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Not Classified By Court

HANGEN, CAROL R.

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENTI , LORRAINE ANN

Attorney at JOHN BALES ATTORNEYS

625 E Twiggs St Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/21/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/21/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/10/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/01/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/01/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/07/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/17/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/17/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/17/2020: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ronald J. Hangen, deceased, by and through Carol R. Hangen, as P.R. of the Estate of Ronald J. hANGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOVEREIGN HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant