This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 18:19:59 (UTC).

Rodriguez, William Thomson vs Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 Rodriguez, William Thomson filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Universal Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9462

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herrera, Leonor Alvarez

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Rodriguez, William Thomson

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTABLE , JAMES SCOTT

Attorney at CONSTABLE LAW, P.A.

139 6Th Ave S

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorney

WURSTER , STEPHANIE

Attorney at GROELLE&SALMON

11301 Okeechobee Blvd Fl 2

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/10/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/10/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/12/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

12/13/2022: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/05/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Herrera, Leonor Alvarez; Plaintiff: Rodriguez, William Thomson;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Herrera, Leonor Alvarez; Plaintiff: Rodriguez, William Thomson;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Herrera, Leonor Alvarez; Plaintiff: Rodriguez, William Thomson;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Herrera, Leonor Alvarez; Plaintiff: Rodriguez, William Thomson;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Herrera, Leonor Alvarez; Plaintiff: Rodriguez, William Thomson;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less