This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/07/2020 at 19:04:52 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Sucivel vs Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Rodriguez, Sucivel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0560

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Sucivel

Davie, FL 33328

Defendant

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Department Of Financial Services P.O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINEO , PETER, Jr

Attorney at THE MINEO SALCEDO LAW FIRM

5400 S University Dr Ste 502

Davie, FL 33328

Defendant Attorney

JAFFE , ANDREW BERNARD

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN GOGGIN

1110 W Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/01/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/16/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/16/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/16/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019476177; Judge: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION- SUCIVEL RODRIGUEZ; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION- CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITIONO OF JOHN TEMPLAR, FIELD ADJUSTER, SCHEDULED FOR 08/28/19 AT 2:00 PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Rodriguez, Sucivel

    Read MoreRead Less